|
06/30/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 1725.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|