|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3793.).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4598.).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|