LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1537
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1537
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1537
Action History
04/10/2012
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/29/2012
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
03/28/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
03/27/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
02/02/2012
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
01/25/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
01/24/2012
Read first time. To print.