06/27/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 3601.) | |||
01/24/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
01/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (January 19). | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/13/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/19/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. | |||
01/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |