California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012