05/31/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5089.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 18). | |||
03/28/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
03/27/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
01/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | |||
01/25/2012 | Read first time. To print. |