|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5102.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|