05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/27/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. | |||
01/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | |||
01/25/2012 | Read first time. To print. |