05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
03/28/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/21/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
03/08/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
01/27/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read first time. To print. |