05/21/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Norby. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
05/02/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/07/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
03/06/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | |||
01/27/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read first time. To print. |