LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1556
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1556
Action History
05/03/2012
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4666.)
04/17/2012
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
04/16/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
04/09/2012
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
01/27/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
01/26/2012
Read first time. To print.