07/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 110, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/13/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/06/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m. | |||
07/02/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/02/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4224.). | |||
06/27/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
06/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
03/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4130.) | |||
03/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
03/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20). | |||
01/27/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read first time. To print. |