08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/26/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5105.) | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
01/31/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | |||
01/30/2012 | Read first time. To print. |