LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1564
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1564
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1564
Action History
03/27/2012
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
03/06/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
02/09/2012
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and REV. & TAX.
01/31/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
01/30/2012
Read first time. To print.