|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6535.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4887.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5105.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and ED.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 1.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|