California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012
Bill March 15, 2012