06/20/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/25/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 4979.) | |||
05/17/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 9). | |||
02/01/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. | |||
01/31/2012 | Read first time. To print. |