02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/10/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
01/05/2012 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3434.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on E. S. & T. M.) | |||
01/04/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Pending re-referral to E. S. & T. M.) | |||
04/05/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and E.S. & T.M. | |||
01/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. | |||
01/19/2011 | Read first time. To print. |