04/25/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/27/2012 | In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/20/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/06/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/02/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | |||
02/01/2012 | Read first time. To print. |