|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6437.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4782.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|