06/13/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 4822.) | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/24/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/23/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/03/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. | |||
02/02/2012 | Read first time. To print. |