|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 856, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6101.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4582.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 4486.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|