BILL NUMBER: AB 1584AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Eng FEBRUARY 2, 2012 An act to amend Section 33430 of, and to repeal Sections 33431 Sections 33430, 33431, and 33432 of , the Education Code, relating to health education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1584, as amended, Eng. Health education: Health Science and Medical Technology Project. Existing law establishes a Health Science and Medical Technology Project, administered by the State Department of Education to provide competitive grant funds to California public schools offering grades 7 to 12, inclusive, to enhance existing or establish new health-related career pathway programs, including programs at California partnership academies and regional occupational centers and programs, as well as other health science and medical technology pathway programs. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to report to the Legislature and the Governor on the efficacy of this project on or before January 1, 2012. Existing law repeals the project as of January 1, 2014. This bill would recast and revise the provisions relating to the Health Science and Medical Technology Project. The bill would add public postsecondary students to the persons who would be eligible to participate in programs supported by grants allocated under the project. The bill would require grant recipients to design and implement a multiyear coherent sequence of standards-based academic and career technical education courses and work-based learning experiences that provide pupils as early as middle school with a structured progression of secondary and postsecondary education. The bill would specify the purposes of the project. The bill would require the department to monitor and review all grantees under the project. The bill would delete the provision requiring instead require the department to report to the Legislature and the Governor on the efficacy of the project on or before January 1, 2012 2016 . The bill would also delete the provision that would repeal the project as of January 1, 2014, thereby extending the project indefinitely move the date of the termination of the operation of the project from January 1, 2014, to July 1, 2018, on which date these provisions would become inoperative, thereby extending the duration of the project by 4 1/2 years . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 33430 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33430. (a) This section establishes the Health Science and Medical Technology Project, administered by the department to provide competitive grant funds to California public schools . Programs serving pupils in middle school or high school or California public postsecondary students to enhance existing, or to establish new, health care career pathway programs. The Superintendent shall approve all final grant allocations under this section. Grant allocations under this section shall be contingent upon the provision of funding in the annual Budget Act. (b) Programs eligible for funding under this section include, but are not necessarily limited to, California partnership academies and regional occupational centers and programs, as well as other health science and medical technology pathway programs. (c) (1) Grant recipients under this section shall, at a minimum, design and implement a multiyear coherent sequence of standards-based academic and career technical education courses and work-based learning experiences that provide pupils as early as middle school with a structured progression of secondary and postsecondary education. A major component of the grant shall be the relationship with education partners to facilitate articulation, dual credit, and other strategies to support pupil advancement, and, as a result, pupils will be able to transition into postsecondary education. (2) The purposes of this project include all of the following: (A) Increasing pupils' interest in, knowledge of, and exposure to the health care industry. (B) Enhancing academic achievement and leadership skills applicable to health care. (C) Providing pupils with a path to complete postsecondary health care programs and complete a health care certificate or license. (D) Pursuing a full range of health care employment at entry, technical, or professional levels. (d) Funding provided for purposes of this section shall be limited to the following activities: (1) Coordination, design, and implementation of an articulated multiyear sequence of courses from middle school through postsecondary education in a selected pathway. (2) Development of standards-based health-science- and medical-technology- focused medical-technology-focused curriculum. (3) Integration of pupil leadership and engagement practices that promote pupils' decisionmaking and career choices. (4) Support of work-based learning experiences. (5) Providing related professional development opportunities. (6) Providing materials and equipment to support academic and technical curriculum alignment in the selected pathway. (e) A grantee under this section shall be monitored and reviewed by the department. Technical assistance shall be provided by the department to ensure that grantees meet the requirements of this section. SEC. 2. Section 33431 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33431. The State Department of Education shall report to the Legislature and the Governor on the efficacy of the project established under this article on or before January 1, 2012 2016 . SEC. 3. Section 33432 of the Education Code is amended to read: 33432. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2014 become inoperative on July 1, 2018 , and , as of that date January 1, 2019, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted becomes operative on or before January 1, 2014 2019 , deletes or extends that date the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed . SEC. 2. Section 33431 of the Education Code is repealed. SEC. 3. Section 33432 of the Education Code is repealed.