California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1588 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill March 5, 2012