|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1688.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1177.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|