|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 809, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4646.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 4775.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|