|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 810, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4702.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 4592.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4559.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|