|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 5041.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|