04/10/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/27/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/20/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |||
02/08/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | |||
02/07/2012 | Read first time. To print. |