05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/19/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/08/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | |||
02/07/2012 | Read first time. To print. |