06/26/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/21/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5109.) | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/26/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/08/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | |||
02/07/2012 | Read first time. To print. |