|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5041.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|