California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill August 30, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012