06/13/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 5042.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 16). | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
02/09/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | |||
02/08/2012 | Read first time. To print. |