California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012