California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1650 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012