|
09/17/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6301.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4699.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 5198.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|