|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 721, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6144.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4575.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 4912.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|