05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/02/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). | |||
04/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
04/11/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
02/15/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | |||
02/14/2012 | Read first time. To print. |