|
09/11/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 290, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5904.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4675.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|