California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1674 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 18, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012