|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 857, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 4648.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 5044.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|