06/28/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5091.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/28/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/19/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/15/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/15/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | |||
02/14/2012 | Read first time. To print. |