California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill June 4, 2012
Bill March 14, 2012