California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill March 15, 2012