California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1687 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill June 18, 2012
Bill June 6, 2012
Bill March 12, 2012