|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5044.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|