LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1701
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1701
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1701
Compare Versions
AB1701 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1701 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1701 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1701 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1701 Amended June 11, 2012
AB1701 Amended May 8, 2012
AB1701 Amended March 27, 2012
AB1701 Amended March 8, 2012
AB1701 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1701 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB1701 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1701 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1701 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1701 Amended June 11, 2012
AB1701 Amended May 8, 2012
AB1701 Amended March 27, 2012
AB1701 Amended March 8, 2012
AB1701 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare