|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4438.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4923.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|