|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 848, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 6641.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 3. Page 4925.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4786.)
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 4811.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|